Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
Perkins , Sonya J, filed a(n) Divorce,Separation - Family case represented by Mclaws , Rebecca W, against Perkins Jr, Eugene A, in the jurisdiction of Paulding County, GA, . Paulding County, GA Superior Courts .
Case Number |
|
Filing DateMay 25, 2016 |
CategoryDivorce Annulment |
Last RefreshedDecember 08, 2021 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationPaulding County, GA |
Matter TypeDivorce,Separation |
Case Outcome TypeNt Judple |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
March 22, 2017 | Docket Event | PC EUGENE PERKINS | |
September 23, 2016 | Docket Event | FINAL JUDG AND DECREE | |
September 23, 2016 | Docket Event | INCOME DEDUCTION ORDER/ CSWS/ CERT OF SERVICE | |
September 23, 2016 | Docket Event | PARENTING PLAN | |
September 14, 2016 | Docket Event | HRG Hearing | |
September 09, 2016 | Docket Event | CONFLICT LETTER - MCLAWS LAW GROUP LLC | |
August 24, 2016 | Docket Event | PC SONYA PERKINS | |
August 22, 2016 | Docket Event | MEDIATION REPORT | |
August 22, 2016 | Docket Event | RULE NISI | |
August 22, 2016 | Docket Event | CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.