Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
Capital One Bank, filed a(n) Breach of Contract - Commercial case represented by Henry , Dennis E, against Davis , Cora P, in the jurisdiction of Paulding County, GA, . Paulding County, GA Superior Courts .
Case Number |
|
Filing DateDecember 31, 2008 |
CategoryContract Account |
Last RefreshedDecember 08, 2021 |
Practice AreaCommercial |
Filing LocationPaulding County, GA |
Matter TypeBreach of Contract |
Case Outcome TypeNt Dismis |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
September 18, 2009 | Docket Event | ANSWER | |
August 20, 2009 | Docket Event | 08/19/09-NOTORIOUS SERVICE | |
August 13, 2009 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL | |
August 13, 2009 | Docket Event | DISP FORM | |
July 30, 2009 | Docket Event | REQUEST FOR SERVICE | |
July 30, 2009 | Docket Event | SERVICE FEE | |
July 24, 2009 | Docket Event | 07/23/09-SERVICE NON EST | |
May 26, 2009 | Docket Event | LETTER DATED 05/15/09 | |
January 26, 2009 | Docket Event | 01/22/09-SERVICE NON EST | |
December 31, 2008 | Docket Event | SUIT ON ACCOUNT |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.