Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
Hometown Bank ,, filed a(n) Other General Civil case represented by Stefaniak , Caroline B, Scearce Jr, Camden Ballard, against Howell , Jon Michael, Jmh Construction, Inc ,, in the jurisdiction of Paulding County, GA, . Paulding County, GA Superior Courts .
Case Number |
|
Filing DateDecember 31, 2008 |
CategoryOther General Civil |
Last RefreshedDecember 08, 2021 |
|
Filing LocationPaulding County, GA |
|
Case Outcome TypeNt Judple |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
September 29, 2009 | Docket Event | FINAL DISP FORM | |
September 29, 2009 | Docket Event | AGREED ORDER CONFIRMING SALE UNDER POWER | |
September 24, 2009 | Docket Event | MOT Motion | |
September 24, 2009 | Docket Event | HRG Hearing | |
September 02, 2009 | Docket Event | AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE | |
September 02, 2009 | Docket Event | COVER LETTER DATED AUG 31 | |
August 13, 2009 | Docket Event | CERT OF SERVICE | |
August 13, 2009 | Docket Event | RULE NISI/ NOTICE OF HEARING ON CONFIRMATION OF FORECLOSURE SALE | |
February 05, 2009 | Docket Event | MOT Motion | |
January 09, 2009 | Docket Event | RULE NISI/NOTICE OF HEARING ON CONFIRMATION OF FORECLOSURE SALE |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.