Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
Kitchens , Alexis K, Kitchens , Gabrielle B, filed a(n) Judgment Enforcement - Creditor case represented by Child Support Enforcement ,, against Kitchens , William David, in the jurisdiction of Paulding County, GA, . Paulding County, GA Superior Courts .
Case Number |
|
Filing DateDecember 16, 2008 |
CategorySupport Enforcement |
Last RefreshedDecember 08, 2021 |
Practice AreaCreditor |
Filing LocationPaulding County, GA |
Matter TypeJudgment Enforcement |
Case Outcome TypeNt Dismis |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
August 11, 2009 | Docket Event | VOL DISMISSAL | |
August 11, 2009 | Docket Event | FINAL DISP FORM | |
August 06, 2009 | Docket Event | MOT Motion | |
August 06, 2009 | Docket Event | HRG Hearing | |
May 07, 2009 | Docket Event | MOT Motion | |
May 07, 2009 | Docket Event | CONSENT CONTEMPT ORDER | |
May 07, 2009 | Docket Event | CERT OF SERVICE | |
February 13, 2009 | Docket Event | ORDER OF CONTINUANCE | |
February 05, 2009 | Docket Event | HRG Hearing | |
February 03, 2009 | Docket Event | - 1/27/2009 PERSONAL SERVICE ON WILLIAM KITCHENS |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.