Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
Williams Bros Lumber Company Llc ,, filed a(n) Breach of Contract - Commercial case represented by Busch , James C, against Cody Enterprises, Inc ,, Panter , Johnny, represented by Almand , Bond H, in the jurisdiction of Paulding County, GA, . Paulding County, GA Superior Courts .
Case Number |
|
Filing DateDecember 16, 2008 |
CategoryContract Account |
Last RefreshedDecember 08, 2021 |
Practice AreaCommercial |
Filing LocationPaulding County, GA |
Matter TypeBreach of Contract |
Case Outcome TypeNt Dismis |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
April 28, 2010 | Docket Event | LETTER | |
April 28, 2010 | Docket Event | DISP FORM | |
April 28, 2010 | Docket Event | DISMISSAL W/PREJUDICE | |
April 28, 2010 | Docket Event | CERT OF SERVICE | |
December 31, 2009 | Docket Event | CERT OF SERVICE | |
December 30, 2009 | Docket Event | ORDER COMPELLING DISCOVERY | |
November 30, 2009 | Docket Event | MNH MOTION NO HEARING | |
November 30, 2009 | Docket Event | MOT Motion | |
October 28, 2009 | Docket Event | LETTER | |
October 28, 2009 | Docket Event | FILING FEES PD FOR MOTION TO COMPEL $82.00 CK#12837 |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.