Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
Caldwell , Jill M, filed a(n) Divorce,Separation - Family case represented by Bucci , Dean C, against Caldwell , Lynn A, in the jurisdiction of Paulding County, GA, . Paulding County, GA Superior Courts .
Case Number |
|
Filing DateJuly 11, 2008 |
CategoryDivorce Annulment |
Last RefreshedDecember 08, 2021 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationPaulding County, GA |
Matter TypeDivorce,Separation |
Case Outcome TypeNt Judple |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
September 04, 2008 | Docket Event | FINAL JUDGMENT/DECREE | |
August 22, 2008 | Docket Event | QUALIFIED DOMESTIC RELATIONS ORDER | |
August 22, 2008 | Docket Event | CERT OF SERVICE | |
July 21, 2008 | Docket Event | PC FOR LYNN CALDWELL | |
July 21, 2008 | Docket Event | PC FOR JILL CALDWELL | |
July 14, 2008 | Docket Event | NOT REFERRED TO MEDIATION- PER ADR | |
July 11, 2008 | Docket Event | STANDING ORDER | |
July 11, 2008 | Docket Event | VERIFICATION | |
July 11, 2008 | Docket Event | SETTLEMENT AGREEMENT | |
July 11, 2008 | Docket Event | MOTION FOR JUDGMENT ON THE PLEADINGS |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.