Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Capital One Bank Usa Na, filed a(n) Collections - Creditor case represented by Walsh, Mark D, against Zarate, Robinet Castillo, in the jurisdiction of Santa Barbara County. This case was filed in Santa Barbara County Superior Courts with Rigali, James F presiding.
Case Number |
||
Filing DateJuly 29, 2010 |
Category09-Contract - Collections - Civil (Limited) |
|
Last RefreshedFebruary 22, 2021 |
Practice AreaCreditor |
Time to Dismissal Following Dispositive Motions54 days |
Filing LocationSanta Barbara County, CA |
Matter TypeCollections |
|
Case Outcome TypeJudgment |
Case Cycle Time54 days |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
November 20, 2013 | Docket Event | Acknowledgment of Satisfaction of Judgment, Filed | |
November 18, 2013 | Docket Event | Acknowledgment of Satisfaction of Judgment, Filed | |
October 29, 2013 | Docket Event | Writ of Execution, Issued | |
November 19, 2010 | Docket Event | Abstract of Judgment, Issued | |
November 15, 2010 | Docket Event | Memorandum of Costs/Credits/Interest, Filed | |
September 21, 2010 | Docket Event | Request for Dismissal of Does/Roes, Filed | |
September 21, 2010 | Docket Event | Supplemental Declaration, Filed | |
September 21, 2010 | Docket Event | Summons | |
September 21, 2010 | Docket Event | Default Judgment by Clerk, Filed | |
September 21, 2010 | Docket Event | Request for Entry of Default and Clerk's Judgment, Filed |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.