Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Capital One Bank Usa Na, filed a(n) Collections - Creditor case represented by Walsh, Mark D, against Lucier, Anne M, in the jurisdiction of Santa Barbara County. This case was filed in Santa Barbara County Superior Courts with Rigali, James F presiding.
Case Number |
||
Filing DateJuly 29, 2010 |
Category09-Contract - Collections - Civil (Limited) |
|
Last RefreshedFebruary 22, 2021 |
Practice AreaCreditor |
Time to Dismissal Following Dispositive Motions76 days |
Filing LocationSanta Barbara County, CA |
Matter TypeCollections |
|
Case Outcome TypeJudgment |
Case Cycle Time76 days |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
October 09, 2013 | Docket Event | Writ of Execution, Issued | |
June 13, 2011 | Docket Event | Notice, Filed | |
March 01, 2011 | Docket Event | Abstract of Judgment, Issued | |
February 28, 2011 | Docket Event | Memorandum of Costs/Credits/Interest, Filed | |
October 13, 2010 | Docket Event | Summons | |
October 13, 2010 | Docket Event | Request for Dismissal of Does/Roes, Filed | |
October 13, 2010 | Docket Event | Request for Entry of Default and Clerk's Judgment, Filed | |
October 13, 2010 | Docket Event | Default Judgment by Clerk, Filed | |
October 13, 2010 | Docket Event | Supplemental Declaration, Filed | |
August 17, 2010 | Docket Event | Proof of Service - Summons & Complaint, Filed |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.