Case Last Refreshed: 1 year ago
Brooks Deneithia Y, filed a(n) Divorce,Separation - Family case represented by Ninfo Mario, against Jackson Michael, Johnson Michael, in the jurisdiction of Newton County, GA, . Newton County, GA Superior Courts with JEFFREY L. FOSTER presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeJEFFREY L. FOSTER Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateFebruary 02, 2023 |
CategoryDissolution/Divorce/Seperate Maintenance |
Last RefreshedFebruary 25, 2023 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationNewton County, GA |
Matter TypeDivorce,Separation |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
February 15, 2023 | Docket Event |
FINANCIAL AFFIDAVIT Domestic Relations Financial Affidavit - Deneithia |
|
February 13, 2023 | Docket Event | SERVICE | |
February 08, 2023 | Docket Event | LEAVE OF ABSENCE | |
February 07, 2023 | Docket Event | SERVICE | |
February 03, 2023 | Docket Event | RECEIPT | |
February 02, 2023 | Docket Event |
CIVIL CASE INITIATION FORM Case Information Form |
|
February 02, 2023 | Docket Event |
SHERIFFS ENTRY OF SERVICE Unexecuted Sheriff's Entry of Service for Jackson, Michael. Note: Please hide until executed. |
|
February 02, 2023 | Docket Event | Report of Divorce | |
February 02, 2023 | Docket Event | Complaint for Divorce | |
February 02, 2023 | Docket Event |
SUMMONS SHERIFF DEPARTMENT Summons for Jackson, Michael. |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.