Case Last Refreshed: 1 year ago
State Of Georgia, filed a(n) Bond Validation case represented by Mcginley Randy, against Archer Aviation Inc, Newton County Industrial Development Authority, represented by Turner Frank B Jr, in the jurisdiction of Newton County, GA, . Newton County, GA Superior Courts with JEFFREY L. FOSTER presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeJEFFREY L. FOSTER Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateJanuary 24, 2023 |
CategoryBond Validation |
Last RefreshedFebruary 24, 2023 |
|
Filing LocationNewton County, GA |
|
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
February 14, 2023 | Docket Event |
CERTIFICATE CLERK'S CERTIFICATE |
|
February 13, 2023 | Docket Event |
ORDER VALIDATION ORDER |
|
February 09, 2023 | Docket Event | ACKNOWLEDGMENT | |
February 09, 2023 | Docket Event | SERVICE | |
February 09, 2023 | Docket Event | ANSWER | |
February 07, 2023 | Docket Event |
CALENDAR BOND VALIDATION |
|
January 24, 2023 | Docket Event | RECEIPT | |
January 24, 2023 | Docket Event |
PETITION 2/13/2023 AT 9AM |
|
January 24, 2023 | Docket Event |
ENTRY OF APPEARANCE NOTICE OF APPEARANCE |
|
January 24, 2023 | Docket Event | RULE NISI |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.