Case Last Refreshed: 1 year ago
Americredit Financial Services Inc, filed a(n) Collections - Creditor case represented by Haan Gregson T, Nadler James Alan, against Lawrence Andre L, Newton County Board Of Commissioners, in the jurisdiction of Newton County, GA, . Newton County, GA Superior Courts with CHEVEDA D. MCCAMY presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateFebruary 10, 2022 |
CategoryGarnishment |
Last RefreshedJuly 29, 2022 |
Practice AreaCreditor |
Filing LocationNewton County, GA |
Matter TypeCollections |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
July 11, 2022 | Docket Event | CHECK PRINTED | |
July 11, 2022 | Docket Event | LETTER TO PLAINTIFF'S ATTORNEY RE: CHECK# 6162 IN THE AMOUNT OF $969.97 MAILED ON 7/15/2022 | |
July 01, 2022 | Docket Event | ANSWER OF GARNISHEE - $1,284.48 PAID INTO COURT | |
June 22, 2022 | Docket Event |
RECEIPT LAWRENCE ANDRE L - NEWTON COUNTY BOARD OF COMMISS. - RECEIPT # 858748 FOR 969.97 |
|
June 17, 2022 | Docket Event | ANSWER OF GARNISHEE - $969.97 PAID INTO COURT | |
June 03, 2022 | Docket Event | CHECK PRINTED | |
June 03, 2022 | Docket Event | LETTER WITH CHECK# 6160 TO PLAINTIFF'S ATTORNEY | |
May 06, 2022 | Docket Event |
RECEIPT LAWRENCE ANDRE L - NEWTON COUNTY BOARD OF COMMISS. - RECEIPT # 853915 FOR 1372.7 |
|
May 06, 2022 | Docket Event | LETTER TO ATTORNEY RE: FUNDS IN THE AMOUNT OF $1,026.23 | |
May 06, 2022 | Docket Event | ANSWER OF GARNISHEE - $1,372.70 PAID INTO COURT |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.