Your recipients will receive an email with this envelope shortly and will be able to access it on trellis. You can always see your envelopes by clicking the Inbox on the top right hand corner.
FREEMAN PHOENIX MCKENIZE et al vs FREEMAN RODERICK K
A Child Support Iv-D case was filed by (Subcribe to view) represented by (Subcribe to view) against (Subscribe to view) in the jurisdiction of Newton County, GA. Judge JEFFREY L. FOSTER presiding.
Case Details
Case Number
Filing Date
February 02, 2022
Last Refreshed
July 29, 2022
Filing Location
Newton County, GA
Judge
Category
CHILD SUPPORT IV-D
Practice Area
Family
Matter Type
Child Support
Status
Other
Parties
Plaintiffs
Attorneys for Plaintiffs
Defendants
Case Events
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
May 18, 2022 | Docket Event |
LETTER FINAL NOTICE |
|
April 18, 2022 | Docket Event |
LETTER SECOND NOTICE |
|
April 13, 2022 | Docket Event | CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE | |
March 30, 2022 | Docket Event |
FINAL DISPOSITION CAE DISPOSTION FORM |
|
March 30, 2022 | Docket Event | CHILD SUPPORT WORKSHEET | |
March 30, 2022 | Docket Event |
LETTER CLERK BILL |
|
March 30, 2022 | Docket Event |
SERVICE ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF SERVICE WAIVER OF JURSIDICTION |
|
March 30, 2022 | Docket Event |
DISPOSITION ORDER FOR PATERNITY AND CHILD SUPPORT |
|
March 30, 2022 | Docket Event |
ORDER CONSENT ORDER AND STIPULATION REGARDING GENETIC TESTING |
|
February 03, 2022 | Docket Event | RULE NISI MARCH 15, 2022 9:30AM | |
February 02, 2022 | Docket Event | COMPLAINT FOR RECOVERY OF CHILD SUPPORT | |
February 02, 2022 | Docket Event | PROPOSED RULE NISI | |
February 02, 2022 | Docket Event |
CASE INITIATION FORM - GADHR Case Information Form |
|
February 02, 2022 | Docket Event | REQUEST FOR ADMISSION OF FACTS | |
February 02, 2022 | Docket Event | NOTICE TO PRODUCE | |
February 02, 2022 | Docket Event |
SUMMONS - GADHR Summons for FREEMAN, RODERICK K. |