Case Last Refreshed: 1 year ago
filed a(n) case in the jurisdiction of Newton County, GA, . Newton County, GA Superior Courts with JEFFREY L. FOSTER presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateFebruary 01, 2022 |
|
Last RefreshedJuly 29, 2022 |
|
Filing LocationNewton County, GA |
|
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
June 14, 2022 | Docket Event |
SERVICE AOD |
|
March 30, 2022 | Docket Event | Order Granting Plaintiff's Motion to Obtain Process Via Process Server | |
March 07, 2022 | Docket Event | Affidavit of Process Server | |
March 07, 2022 | Docket Event | Motion to Obtain Process Via Process Server | |
February 10, 2022 | Docket Event |
SERVICE SHERIFF SERVICE NON EST DOES NOT LIVE THERE |
|
February 02, 2022 | Docket Event | RECEIPT | |
February 01, 2022 | Docket Event |
SUMMONS SHERIFF DEPARTMENT Summons for Samuel, Juwon. |
|
February 01, 2022 | Docket Event | Complaint | |
February 01, 2022 | Docket Event |
INTERROGATORIES ROGs to Def |
|
February 01, 2022 | Docket Event |
REQUEST RFA to Def |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.