Case Last Refreshed: 1 year ago
Valerio Alex, filed a(n) Divorce,Separation - Family case represented by Valerio Alex -Pro Se, against Valerio Jessica, represented by Valerio Jessica -Pro Se, in the jurisdiction of Newton County, GA, . Newton County, GA Superior Courts with CHEVEDA D. MCCAMY presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateJanuary 21, 2022 |
CategoryDissolution/Divorce/Seperate Maintenance |
Last RefreshedJuly 29, 2022 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationNewton County, GA |
Matter TypeDivorce,Separation |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
April 13, 2022 | Docket Event | CHILD SUPPORT ADDENDUM | |
April 13, 2022 | Docket Event | PARENTING PLAN | |
April 13, 2022 | Docket Event |
DISPOSITION FINAL JUDGMENT AND DECREE OF DIVORCE |
|
April 05, 2022 | Docket Event |
CALENDAR DIVORCE - FINAL HEARING |
|
March 22, 2022 | Docket Event | DIVORCING PARENTS SEMINAR CERTIFICATE | |
February 23, 2022 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF HEARING 04/13/22 | |
February 21, 2022 | Docket Event | REQUEST FOR HEARING | |
February 21, 2022 | Docket Event | CHILD SUPPORT WORKSHEET WITH CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE | |
February 21, 2022 | Docket Event |
FINANCIAL AFFIDAVIT AINANCIAL AFFIDAVIT |
|
February 07, 2022 | Docket Event | DIVORCING PARENTS SEMINAR CERTIFICATE - ALEX VALERIO |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.