Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
Davis Ayva R, Davis Roman Andres, The Georgia Department Of Human Services, Ex.Rel.,, filed a(n) Child Support - Family case represented by Moss Lee, against Stephens-Davis Adondre Desean, in the jurisdiction of Newton County, GA, . Newton County, GA Superior Courts with LAYLA H. ZON presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateApril 21, 2021 |
CategoryChild Support Iv-D |
Last RefreshedFebruary 08, 2022 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationNewton County, GA |
Matter TypeChild Support |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
December 29, 2021 | Docket Event | CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE | |
December 17, 2021 | Docket Event | CHILD SUPPORT WORKSHEET | |
December 17, 2021 | Docket Event |
DISPOSITION FINAL ORDER FOR PATERNITY AND CHILD SUPPORT |
|
December 17, 2021 | Docket Event |
FINAL DISPOSITION CASE DISPOSIITON FORM |
|
July 23, 2021 | Docket Event | PROPOSED RULE NISI | |
July 23, 2021 | Docket Event | RULE NISI DECEMBER 2, 2021 9:30AM | |
July 22, 2021 | Docket Event | CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE | |
July 13, 2021 | Docket Event | CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE | |
July 07, 2021 | Docket Event |
FINAL DISPOSITION CASE DISPOSIITON FORM |
|
July 07, 2021 | Docket Event |
LETTER CLERK BILL |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.