Case Last Refreshed: 1 month ago
Georgia Department Of Human Services, Netterville, Jaylen, The Georgia Department Of Human Services, Ex. Rel.,, filed a(n) Judgment Enforcement - Creditor case represented by Baun, Julia, against Netterville, Jaylen, in the jurisdiction of Lowndes County, GA, . Lowndes County, GA Superior Courts with Gregory A. Voyles presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeGregory A. Voyles Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateJanuary 16, 2024 |
CategorySupport Enforcement* |
Last RefreshedMarch 15, 2024 |
Practice AreaCreditor |
Filing LocationLowndes County, GA |
Matter TypeJudgment Enforcement |
This complaint is a legal document filed in the Superior Court of Lowndes County, Georgia by the Georgia Department of Human Services on behalf of a minor child named Jaylen Netterville. The complaint is for the recovery of child support from the def...
Summons
Date: January 16, 2024Notice
Date: January 16, 2024Rule NISI
Date: January 16, 2024Petition/Complaint
Date: January 16, 2024Service
Date: February 22, 2024Return Sheriffs Service
Date: February 21, 2024Notice
Date: February 22, 2024Acknowledgment
Date: February 22, 2024Miscellaneous
Date: January 16, 2024Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
March 14, 2024 | Docket Event |
Hearing
Judge: Voyles, Gregory A. |
|
February 22, 2024 | Docket Event |
CERTIFCATE OF SERVICE Service |
|
February 22, 2024 | Docket Event |
COURT 3/14/2024 Notice |
|
February 22, 2024 | Docket Event |
ACK OF SERVICE Acknowledgment |
|
February 21, 2024 | Docket Event |
NETTERVILLE, JAYLEN - Service Return Sheriffs Service Attempted to serve Jaylen Netterville on 02/13/24. Does not live here per resident |
|
February 19, 2024 | Docket Event |
Rule NiSi
Judge: Cowart, Richard M. |
|
January 26, 2024 | Docket Event |
Service Attempted service on 02/13/24 |
|
January 16, 2024 | Docket Event |
Summons Netterville, Jaylen (130029920)(2) |
|
January 16, 2024 | Docket Event |
NOTICE TO PRODUCE Notice |
|
January 16, 2024 | Docket Event |
COURT 2/19/2024 Rule NISI |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.