Case Last Refreshed: 4 weeks ago
filed a(n) General Criminal - Criminal case against Tolbert, Erin Rose, in the jurisdiction of Lowndes County, GA, . Lowndes County, GA Superior Courts .
Case Number |
|
Filing DateFebruary 13, 2024 |
CategoryAdult Misdemeanor (Citations) |
Last RefreshedApril 05, 2024 |
Practice AreaCriminal |
Filing LocationLowndes County, GA |
Matter TypeGeneral Criminal |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
May 09, 2024 | Docket Event | Arraignment Hearing | |
April 04, 2024 | Docket Event | Arraignment Hearing | |
April 03, 2024 | Docket Event | Notice of Continuance for 5/09/2024 at 9am. | |
February 22, 2024 | Docket Event | Citation Notice of Arraignment Letter Sent | |
February 13, 2024 | Docket Event | Citation |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.