Case Last Refreshed: 1 month ago
filed a(n) General Criminal - Criminal case against Bass, David Gregory, in the jurisdiction of Lowndes County, GA, . Lowndes County, GA Superior Courts .
Case Number |
|
Filing DateFebruary 13, 2024 |
CategoryAdult Misdemeanor (Citations) |
Last RefreshedApril 03, 2024 |
Practice AreaCriminal |
Filing LocationLowndes County, GA |
Matter TypeGeneral Criminal |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
May 07, 2024 | Docket Event |
Arraignment Hearing Pay $800. |
|
April 02, 2024 | Docket Event | Notice of Continuance for 5/07/2024 at 9am. Pay $800. | |
April 02, 2024 | Docket Event | Arraignment Hearing | |
February 22, 2024 | Docket Event | Citation Notice of Arraignment Letter Sent | |
February 13, 2024 | Docket Event | Citation |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.