Case Last Refreshed: 3 weeks ago
Forest Park Ga Llc, filed a(n) Landlord-Tenant - Property case against Bethel, Emerald, in the jurisdiction of Lowndes County, GA, . Lowndes County, GA Superior Courts with Cleveland, Elizabeth presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateMarch 14, 2024 |
CategoryDispossessory* |
Last RefreshedApril 04, 2024 |
Practice AreaProperty |
Filing LocationLowndes County, GA |
Matter TypeLandlord-Tenant |
Case Outcome TypeJudgment |
Trial Notice Mailed
Date: March 22, 2024Answer Due in 7 Days
Date: March 21, 2024Answer Date
Date: March 20, 2024Designation of Agent for Business Entity
Date: March 14, 2024Service Document
Date: March 14, 2024Dispossessory
Date: March 14, 2024Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
April 03, 2024 | Docket Event |
Trial*
Judge: Cleveland, Elizabeth |
|
March 22, 2024 | Docket Event | Trial Notice Mailed | |
March 21, 2024 | Docket Event | Answer Due in 7 Days | |
March 20, 2024 | Docket Event | Answer Date | |
March 14, 2024 | Docket Event | Designation of Agent for Business Entity | |
March 14, 2024 | Docket Event |
Return to Court Service Document |
|
March 14, 2024 | Docket Event | Dispossessory | |
March 14, 2024 | Docket Event | Answer Due in 7 Days | |
March 14, 2024 | Docket Event | Dispossessory Service |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.