Case Last Refreshed: 1 year ago
Council, Sherri Lynette, filed a(n) Landlord-Tenant - Property case against Taylor & All Occupants, Brenda, in the jurisdiction of Lowndes County, GA, . Lowndes County, GA Superior Courts .
Case Number |
|
Filing DateDecember 28, 2022 |
CategoryDispossessory* |
Last RefreshedJanuary 19, 2023 |
Practice AreaProperty |
Filing LocationLowndes County, GA |
Matter TypeLandlord-Tenant |
Dispossessory
Date: December 28, 2022Service Document
Date: December 29, 2022Hearing Notice Mailed
Date: January 06, 2023Answer Date
Date: January 05, 2023Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
January 18, 2023 | Docket Event |
Hearing
Judge: Cleveland, Elizabeth |
|
January 06, 2023 | Docket Event | Hearing Notice Mailed | |
January 05, 2023 | Docket Event | Answer Date | |
December 29, 2022 | Docket Event |
Return to Court Service Document |
|
December 29, 2022 | Docket Event | Answer Due in 7 Days | |
December 28, 2022 | Docket Event | Dispossessory | |
December 28, 2022 | Docket Event | Dispossessory Service |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.