Case Last Refreshed: 1 year ago
Lph Hawkeye, Llc, Obeng, Pete, filed a(n) Landlord-Tenant - Property case against Smith, Charlotte, Smith, Sharletta, in the jurisdiction of Lowndes County, GA, . Lowndes County, GA Superior Courts with Parker, Joni presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateDecember 13, 2022 |
CategoryDispossessory* |
Last RefreshedJanuary 11, 2023 |
Practice AreaProperty |
Filing LocationLowndes County, GA |
Matter TypeLandlord-Tenant |
Case Outcome TypeJudgment |
Hearing Notice Mailed
Date: December 30, 2022Dispossessory
Date: December 13, 2022Unlocatable Letters
Date: December 15, 2022Unlocatable
Date: December 15, 2022Answer Date
Date: December 28, 2022Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
January 09, 2023 | Docket Event |
Hearing
Judge: Parker, Joni |
|
December 30, 2022 | Docket Event | Hearing Notice Mailed | |
December 28, 2022 | Docket Event | Answer Date | |
December 15, 2022 | Docket Event | Unlocatable Letters | |
December 15, 2022 | Docket Event |
Return to Court Unlocatable |
|
December 13, 2022 | Docket Event | Dispossessory | |
December 13, 2022 | Docket Event | Designation of Agent for Business Entity | |
December 13, 2022 | Docket Event | Dispossessory Service |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.