Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
Choates, Torrance, filed a(n) Landlord-Tenant - Property case against West, Kelsie, West, Slater, in the jurisdiction of Lowndes County, GA, . Lowndes County, GA Superior Courts .
Case Number |
|
Filing DateNovember 18, 2021 |
CategoryDispossessory* |
Last RefreshedDecember 07, 2021 |
Practice AreaProperty |
Filing LocationLowndes County, GA |
Matter TypeLandlord-Tenant |
Answer Due in 7 Days
Date: November 19, 2021Answer Date
Date: November 22, 2021Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
December 06, 2021 | Docket Event |
Notice of Hearing Hearing Judge: Cleveland, Elizabeth |
|
November 23, 2021 | Docket Event | Hearing Notice Mailed | |
November 22, 2021 | Docket Event | Answer Date | |
November 19, 2021 | Docket Event | Answer Due in 7 Days | |
November 18, 2021 | Docket Event | Dispossessory | |
November 18, 2021 | Docket Event | Dispossessory Service |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.