Case Last Refreshed: 6 months ago
Jolley, Daniel, filed a(n) Automobile - Torts case represented by Phillips, Johnny G, Reilly, Christopher, against Crowe, Samuel, represented by Deere, Jason H, Sumner, Claire A, in the jurisdiction of Gwinnett County, GA, . Gwinnett County, GA Superior Courts with Debra K. Turner presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateJanuary 11, 2023 |
CategoryTort - Auto Tort* |
Last RefreshedOctober 11, 2023 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationGwinnett County, GA |
Matter TypeAutomobile |
Notice of Leave of Absence - Jolley
Date: March 24, 2023Defendant's Rule 5.2 - Certificate of Service of Discovery - Jolley
Date: March 24, 2023Defendant's Jury Trial Demand - Jolley
Date: March 24, 2023Defendant's Answer to Complaint - Jolley
Date: March 24, 2023Defendant's Rule 5.2 - Certificate of Service of Discovery - Jolley
Date: April 20, 20232023.04.20 - Rule 5.2 - Def's NPRPDs
Date: April 21, 2023PLTFS 5.2 COS TO DEF ROGS RPDS
Date: April 25, 2023Defendant's Rule 5.2 - Certificate of Service of Discovery Jolley
Date: April 28, 2023Notice to Take Deposition of Plaintiff - Jolley
Date: May 02, 20232023.05.12 Jolley Addtl NPRPD Rule 5.2 COS
Date: May 15, 2023Amended Notice to Take Deposition of Plaintiff - Jolley
Date: August 07, 2023Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
August 07, 2023 | Docket Event | Amended Notice to Take Deposition of Plaintiff - Jolley | |
May 15, 2023 | Docket Event | 2023.05.12 Jolley Addtl NPRPD Rule 5.2 COS | |
May 02, 2023 | Docket Event | Notice to Take Deposition of Plaintiff - Jolley | |
April 28, 2023 | Docket Event | Defendant's Rule 5.2 - Certificate of Service of Discovery Jolley | |
April 25, 2023 | Docket Event | PLTFS 5.2 COS TO DEF ROGS RPDS | |
April 21, 2023 | Docket Event | 2023.04.20 - Rule 5.2 - Def's NPRPDs | |
April 20, 2023 | Docket Event | Defendant's Rule 5.2 - Certificate of Service of Discovery - Jolley | |
March 24, 2023 | Docket Event | Notice of Leave of Absence - Jolley | |
March 24, 2023 | Docket Event | Defendant's Rule 5.2 - Certificate of Service of Discovery - Jolley | |
March 24, 2023 | Docket Event | Defendant's Jury Trial Demand - Jolley |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.