Case Last Refreshed: 11 months ago
Sterling Credit Corp., filed a(n) Collections - Creditor case represented by Dunlap, Wes, against Roy, Wilnarah, in the jurisdiction of Gwinnett County, GA, . Gwinnett County, GA Superior Courts .
Case Number |
|
Filing DateNovember 02, 2021 |
CategoryEfile Continuing Garnishment |
Last RefreshedJuly 13, 2023 |
Practice AreaCreditor |
Filing LocationGwinnett County, GA |
Matter TypeCollections |
Garnishement paperwork
Date: March 17, 2022Defendent Claim Form
Date: March 17, 202274871 - Signed Garn Dismissal 21-GM-17009
Date: April 28, 2022Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
April 28, 2022 | Docket Event | 74871 - Signed Garn Dismissal 21-GM-17009 | |
March 31, 2022 | Docket Event |
Garnishment Traverse DEENDANT CLAIM |
|
March 17, 2022 | Docket Event | Garnishement paperwork | |
March 17, 2022 | Docket Event | Defendent Claim Form | |
March 17, 2022 | Docket Event |
Defendant's Claim Form Defendant Claim Form |
|
February 22, 2022 | Docket Event | Garnishment Payment | |
February 22, 2022 | Docket Event | Garnishee's Answer | |
January 25, 2022 | Docket Event | Garnishment Payment | |
January 25, 2022 | Docket Event | Garnishee's Answer | |
December 28, 2021 | Docket Event | Garnishment Payment |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.