Case Last Refreshed: 8 months ago
Second Round Llc As Assignee Of Synchrony Bank, filed a(n) Collections - Creditor case represented by Nam, Judy, against Anderson, Thomas, in the jurisdiction of Gwinnett County, GA, . Gwinnett County, GA Superior Courts .
Case Number |
|
Filing DateNovember 02, 2021 |
CategoryEfile Financial Garnishment |
Last RefreshedOctober 11, 2023 |
Practice AreaCreditor |
Filing LocationGwinnett County, GA |
Matter TypeCollections |
GA726007 APP4FUNDS
Date: January 18, 2022Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
January 18, 2022 | Docket Event | GA726007 APP4FUNDS | |
January 18, 2022 | Docket Event |
Request to Disburse Funds APP 4 FUNDS |
|
December 02, 2021 | Docket Event | Proof of Service/Cert of Service on Defendant - Garnishment | |
December 02, 2021 | Docket Event |
Request to Disburse Funds IMPROPER - WRONG GARNISHEE NAME |
|
November 29, 2021 | Docket Event | Garnishee's Answer | |
November 29, 2021 | Docket Event | Garnishment Payment | |
November 24, 2021 | Docket Event | Sheriffs Entry of Service | |
November 24, 2021 | Docket Event |
Zero Answer Filed by Garnishee Financial Institution Garnishee Answer |
|
November 23, 2021 | Docket Event | Service | |
November 02, 2021 | Docket Event |
Financial Garnishment Initiation Documents GARN AFF |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.