Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
Aarons Llc, filed a(n) Foreclosure - Property case against Cox, Shalonda, in the jurisdiction of Gwinnett County, GA, . Gwinnett County, GA Superior Courts .
Case Number |
|
Filing DateNovember 17, 2021 |
CategoryForeclosures & Attachments* |
Last RefreshedDecember 16, 2021 |
Practice AreaProperty |
Filing LocationGwinnett County, GA |
Matter TypeForeclosure |
Case Outcome TypeJudgment |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
December 15, 2021 | Docket Event | Order - Dismissal for Want of Prosecution | |
December 15, 2021 | Docket Event | Dispossessories Calendar | |
December 06, 2021 | Docket Event | Answer | |
December 02, 2021 | Docket Event | Sheriffs Entry of Service | |
November 30, 2021 | Docket Event | Service | |
November 17, 2021 | Docket Event | Personal Property Foreclosure | |
November 17, 2021 | Docket Event | Election of Option |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.