Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
Bmf Iv Ga Parc 980 Llc Dba Parc @ 980, filed a(n) Landlord-Tenant - Property case against Micheaux, Matthew, in the jurisdiction of Gwinnett County, GA, . Gwinnett County, GA Superior Courts .
Case Number |
|
Filing DateNovember 15, 2021 |
CategoryDispossessory* |
Last RefreshedFebruary 18, 2022 |
Practice AreaProperty |
Filing LocationGwinnett County, GA |
Matter TypeLandlord-Tenant |
21-M-31989
Date: February 11, 2022Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
February 11, 2022 | Docket Event | 21-M-31989 | |
December 08, 2021 | Docket Event | Dispossessories Calendar | |
December 06, 2021 | Docket Event | Returned Mail | |
November 29, 2021 | Docket Event | Affidavit of Process Server | |
November 29, 2021 | Docket Event | Answer | |
November 15, 2021 | Docket Event | Service | |
November 15, 2021 | Docket Event |
Dispossessory Proceeding Of the plaintiff |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.