Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
Westdale Asset Management D B A Gwinnett Square Apartments, filed a(n) Landlord-Tenant - Property case represented by Colston, Elizabeth E, against Scott, Carla, in the jurisdiction of Gwinnett County, GA, . Gwinnett County, GA Superior Courts .
Case Number |
|
Filing DateNovember 15, 2021 |
CategoryDispossessory* |
Last RefreshedDecember 16, 2021 |
Practice AreaProperty |
Filing LocationGwinnett County, GA |
Matter TypeLandlord-Tenant |
Case Outcome TypeJudgment |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
December 16, 2021 | Docket Event | Writ Of Possession | |
December 16, 2021 | Docket Event | Consent Judgment | |
December 15, 2021 | Docket Event | Dispossessories Calendar | |
December 07, 2021 | Docket Event | Affidavit of Process Server | |
December 03, 2021 | Docket Event | Answer | |
November 15, 2021 | Docket Event |
Dispossessory Proceeding Dispossessory |
|
November 15, 2021 | Docket Event | Service |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.