Case Last Refreshed: 4 months ago
Lawson, Joshua, filed a(n) Custody,Visitation - Family case represented by Mcreynolds, Jule, Jr., against Lawson, Scarlette, in the jurisdiction of Gwinnett County, GA, . Gwinnett County, GA Superior Courts .
Case Number |
|
Filing DateDecember 02, 2021 |
CategoryModification - Child Custody/Visitation/Parenting Time* |
Last RefreshedDecember 17, 2023 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationGwinnett County, GA |
Matter TypeCustody,Visitation |
2022 Notice of Leave of Absence - Ravelle Smith
Date: January 20, 2022Emergency Temporary Hearing Order - 0201-22
Date: February 02, 202222 Lawson Emergency Temporary Hearing Order - 0202-22
Date: February 02, 2022Motion to Withdraw
Date: February 03, 2022Order Granting Withdrawal as Counsel for Petitioner
Date: February 14, 2022Rule 4.3 Certificate
Date: February 14, 202220 Lawson Emergency Temporary Hearing Order - 0202-22
Date: February 14, 202222 Lawson v. Lawson Order granting withdrawal
Date: February 14, 202220220516150241346
Date: May 16, 202221-A-0934710 CASE DISPO
Date: May 16, 202220220516150304184
Date: May 16, 202220220516150252214
Date: May 16, 2022Notice of Substitution of Counsel
Date: January 20, 2022Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
May 16, 2022 | Docket Event | ||
May 16, 2022 | Docket Event | 21-A-0934710 CASE DISPO | |
May 16, 2022 | Docket Event | ||
May 16, 2022 | Docket Event | ||
February 14, 2022 | Docket Event | Order Granting Withdrawal as Counsel for Petitioner | |
February 14, 2022 | Docket Event | Rule 4.3 Certificate | |
February 14, 2022 | Docket Event | 20 Lawson Emergency Temporary Hearing Order - 0202-22 | |
February 14, 2022 | Docket Event | 22 Lawson v. Lawson Order granting withdrawal | |
February 14, 2022 | Docket Event | 22 Lawson v. Lawson csw | |
February 03, 2022 | Docket Event | Motion to Withdraw |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.