Related Content
in Fulton County
Ruling
Conservatorship of: Elizabeth Sandra Nixon
Jul 15, 2024 |
P24-00382
P24-00382 CONSERVATORSHIP OF: ELIZABETH SANDRA NIXON
9:00 AM HEARING IN RE: PETITION FOR APPOINTMENT OF CONSERVATOR OF THE PERSON AND ESTATE FILED
ON 2/28/2024 BY ANDREW WEBB
Need appearances to report status of restraining order, pursuant to 5-6-minute order
The Court is waiting for these items:
1. Court Investigator’s Report
Notes:
1. Attachment 1.l. requests an order that estate planning documents be deemed
invalid; however, no such documents have been filed.
2. Capacity Declaration filed 3-29-2024 indicates conservatee has capacity and
MNCD.
3. Objection of Courtney Sownders Peal filed 3-18-2024.
SUPERIOR COURT OF CALIFORNIA, CONTRA COSTA COUNTY
PR - MARTINEZ-WAKEFIELD TAYLOR COURTHOUSE
COURT CALENDAR FOR JULY 15, 2024
DEPARTMENT 33
JUDICIAL OFFICER: SHARA E BELTRAMO
Ruling
Matter of: The Marlene A. March Revocable Trust Dated July 1st, 2019
Jun 18, 2024 |
P24-00342
P24-00342 MATTER OF: THE MARLENE A. MARCH REVOCABLE TRUST DATED JULY 1ST, 2019
9:00 AM HEARING IN RE: PETITION TO COMPEL TRUSTEE TO ACCOUNT FILED ON 02/27/2024 BY JAMES D.
MARCH
--see also line # 14--
Petitioner still must do the following:
1. Appear at the hearing
2. File a verified declaration to verify the Petition. Petition needs to be verified.
PrC § 1021. CCP § 2015.5. CRC 7.103
3. Have Judicial Council Form Notice of Hearing mailed to all persons entitled to
receive notice and file the completed Notice with the Court. PrC § 17203
Ruling
Estate of William Gardner
Jun 27, 2024 |
P22-02038
P22-02038 ESTATE OF WILLIAM GARDNER
9:00 AM HEARING IN RE: PETITION FOR FINAL DISRIBUTION ON WAIVER OF ACCOUNTING FILED ON
1/23/2024 BY ROBERT S. GARDNER
Petitioner still must do the following:
1. File a verified declaration to show that notice of administration was given to the
Franchise Tax Board. PrC § 9202(c)(1)
2. File a verified declaration to specify plan of distribution, including approximate
amount of cash and percentage of ownership in real property to be distributed
to each heir. LR 7.307(a)
3. Submit a Proposed Order to include list of assets on hand available for
distribution and plan of distribution including approximate amount of cash to be
distributed to each heir. LR 7.307(a); 7.101
SUPERIOR COURT OF CALIFORNIA, CONTRA COSTA COUNTY
PR - MARTINEZ-WAKEFIELD TAYLOR COURTHOUSE
COURT CALENDAR FOR JUNE 27, 2024
DEPARTMENT 33
JUDICIAL OFFICER: SHARA E BELTRAMO
Ruling
Estate of: CASEY MCCANN
Jul 17, 2024 |
P24-00921
P24-00921 ESTATE OF: CASEY MCCANN
9:05 AM HEARING IN RE: PETITON FOR LETTERS OF ADMINISTRATION FILED BY KELLY MCCANN ON 5/30/24
Petition Approved
Proposed Order Submitted
No Appearance Required
SUPERIOR COURT OF CALIFORNIA, CONTRA COSTA COUNTY
PR - MARTINEZ-WAKEFIELD TAYLOR COURTHOUSE
COURT CALENDAR FOR JULY 17, 2024
DEPARTMENT 33
JUDICIAL OFFICER: SHARA E BELTRAMO
Ruling
Estate of: Robert Lincoln
Jul 25, 2024 |
P23-02154
P23-02154 ESTATE OF: ROBERT LINCOLN
9:00 AM HEARING IN RE: PETITION FOR LETTERS OF ADMINISTRATION FILED ON 12/13/23 BY KIM CHERI
LINCOLN AND CYNTHIA ANN LINCOLN
--see also line # 12--
Petitioners, daughters, still must do the following:
1. Appear at the hearing
2. Have a Notice of Petition to Administer Estate Form DE-121 and copy of
petition mailed to all persons entitled to receive notice and file a Proof of
Service with court. PrC § 8100; LR 7.151(e)
3. File a verified declaration to address petition Item #5.b. (whether decedent was
survived by a stepchild or foster child or children who would have been
adopted, but for a legal barrier)
4. File a verified declaration to address Item # 3.d. (fair market value of estate)
5. File Waiver of Bond by Heir or Beneficiary on mandatory Judicial Council Form
DE-142 by surviving spouse or bond will be fixed at fair market value of estate.
PrC § 8481
6. Submit Order for Probate Form DE-140
Notes:
a. Petition and Proof of Publication state a will is being admitted; however, Item #
3.f. does not indicate that a will is being offered for probate.
b. Objection filed 04/24/24 by Sharon Ann Lincoln
SUPERIOR COURT OF CALIFORNIA, CONTRA COSTA COUNTY
PR - MARTINEZ-WAKEFIELD TAYLOR COURTHOUSE
COURT CALENDAR FOR JULY 25, 2024
DEPARTMENT 30
JUDICIAL OFFICER: VIRGINIA M GEORGE
16A. MSP20-00810 ESTATE OF DAVID JORDEN
10:30 AM HEARING ON PETITION IN RE: SPOUSAL PROPERTY PETITION FILED 11/09/20 BY FLORENCE JORDEN
SUBSEQUENT PETITION FILED
Need:
1. Appearances to report status, including discovery ordered to be completed by
06/27/2024
2. Appearance by attorney Martin Lettunich in person, not via Zoom
3. Revised Proposed Order, with separate attachments 5a and 7a that include the
percentage of property
Notes:
a. Will authorizes distribution to a predeceased spouse; and if deceased, to his
issue.
b. Letters Testamentary issued to Michelle Jorden 11-24-2020.
c. Executrix Michelle Jorden’s Response filed 6-9-2021.
SUPERIOR COURT OF CALIFORNIA, CONTRA COSTA COUNTY
PR - MARTINEZ-WAKEFIELD TAYLOR COURTHOUSE
COURT CALENDAR FOR JULY 25, 2024
DEPARTMENT 30
JUDICIAL OFFICER: VIRGINIA M GEORGE
16B. MSP20-00810 ESTATE OF DAVID JORDEN
10:30 AM *ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE AGAINST FLORENCE JORDEN AS TO WHY THEY SHOULD NOT BE FINED FOR
FAILURE TO COMPLY WITH DISCOVERY NOTICE FILED RE:
Need appearance by Florence Jorden in person, not via Zoom
Ruling
Matter of: The Sally J. Baker Trust dated December 30, 2020
Jul 25, 2024 |
P23-01801
P23-01801 MATTER OF: THE SALLY J. BAKER TRUST DATED DECEMBER 30, 2020
9:00 AM HEARING ON PETITION IN RE: PETITION FOR ORDER INVALIDATING TRUST; INVALIDATING WILL;
DETERMINING FINANCIAL ELDER ABUSE; CONFIRMING ESTATE ASSETS; AND FOR DISINHERITANCE,
DOUBLE DAMAGES, AND ATTORNEYS FEES FILED ON 10/9/23 BY JASON BAKER
Need:
1. Appearances
2. Proposed Order
Notes:
Objection filed 02/13/24 by Aaron S. Baker
SUPERIOR COURT OF CALIFORNIA, CONTRA COSTA COUNTY
PR - MARTINEZ-WAKEFIELD TAYLOR COURTHOUSE
COURT CALENDAR FOR JULY 25, 2024
DEPARTMENT 30
JUDICIAL OFFICER: VIRGINIA M GEORGE
Ruling
Estate of: Bahareh Ghanaat
Jul 17, 2024 |
P24-00894
P24-00894 ESTATE OF: BAHAREH GHANAAT
9:05 AM HEARING IN RE: PETITION FOR LETTERS OF ADMINISTRATION FILED BY STAR GHANAAT ON 5/24/24
Need:
1. Proof of Publication. PrC § 8120
2. Order for Probate Form DE-140
SUPERIOR COURT OF CALIFORNIA, CONTRA COSTA COUNTY
PR - MARTINEZ-WAKEFIELD TAYLOR COURTHOUSE
COURT CALENDAR FOR JULY 17, 2024
DEPARTMENT 33
JUDICIAL OFFICER: SHARA E BELTRAMO
Ruling
Guardianship of: SAMANTHA DELEON
Jul 17, 2024 |
P22-01711
P22-01711 GUARDIANSHIP OF: SAMANTHA DELEON
9:30 AM HEARING IN RE: PETITION FOR TERMINATION OF GUARDIANSHIP FILED BY STEPHANIE DUARTE ON
11/8/2023
Petitioner, mother, still must do the following:
1. Appear at the hearing to report status
2. File a verified declaration to include current addresses of father, maternal
grandfather, and paternal grandfather
3. Have a Judicial Council Form Notice of Hearing and copy of petition mailed to
all persons entitled to receive notice, except paternal grandmother who
appeared 3-22-2024, and file a Proof of Service with court.
The Court is waiting for these items:
1. Verified response from guardian
2. Report of atty. Nicolas Vaca
Notes:
1. Letters of Guardianship issued to paternal grandmother Jenny Mazariegos
Calderson 3-24-2023.
2. Spanish Interpreter is requested.
SUPERIOR COURT OF CALIFORNIA, CONTRA COSTA COUNTY
PR - MARTINEZ-WAKEFIELD TAYLOR COURTHOUSE
COURT CALENDAR FOR JULY 17, 2024
DEPARTMENT 33
JUDICIAL OFFICER: SHARA E BELTRAMO
15A. P23-01862 GUARDIANSHIP OF: MARIELA RUIZ
9:30 AM HEARING IN RE: PETITION FOR APPOINTMENT OF GUARDIAN OF THE PERSON FILED 10/24/23 BY
MERCY SUPNET & ISAIAH MAJARO
Petitioners, maternal grandmother and sibling, still must do the following:
1. Appear at the hearing to report status, including mediation ordered 3-22-2024.
2. File a verified declaration to include name and current address of paternal
grandfather
3. Have a Notice of Hearing and copy of petition mailed to maternal grandfather
James Majaro at address in Decl. filed 6-6-2024. Proof of Service attached to
Notice filed 6-11-2024 reflects mailing to him at an address other than that
listed in Declaration.
4. Do one or the other, but not both: (1) Have a copy of the Notice of Hearing and
Petition Form GC-210 served by mail on paternal grandfather, and file Proof of
Service or have him sign a consent and waiver form (GC-211); OR (2) If he
cannot be found, submit a declaration (GC-02) explaining what efforts have
been made to find him. CRC 7.52
Notes:
1. Letters of Temporary Guardianship issued to petitioners expire 7-24-2024.
2. Objection of mother Monique Ruiz filed 11-6-2023.
3. Ex Parte Petition to Terminate Temporary Guardianship filed by father Alan
Ruiz is currently unavailable for review at this time.
4. Court will dispense with further formal service on father Alan Ruiz Gomez who
appeared 11-27-2023.
5. Reportedly, minor Alan Ignacio Ruiz, Jr. is now deceased.
6. Petition for Termination filed by mother was deemed an objection, pursuant to
1-26-2024 minute order.
7. Stipulation and Order re: mediation filed 4-15-2024.
SUPERIOR COURT OF CALIFORNIA, CONTRA COSTA COUNTY
PR - MARTINEZ-WAKEFIELD TAYLOR COURTHOUSE
COURT CALENDAR FOR JULY 17, 2024
DEPARTMENT 33
JUDICIAL OFFICER: SHARA E BELTRAMO
15B. P23-01862 GUARDIANSHIP OF: MARIELA RUIZ
9:30 AM HEARING IN RE: PETITION FOR APPOINTMENT OF GUARDIAN OF THE PERSON FILED ON 01/22/2024
BY MARIA MAJARO
Petitioner, maternal aunt, still must do the following:
1. Appear at the hearing to report status, including mediation ordered 1-26-2024.
2. File a verified declaration to include name and current address of paternal
grandfather
3. Do one or the other, but not both: (1) Have a copy of the Notice of Hearing and
Petition Form GC-210 personally served on mother and file Proof of Service or
have her sign a consent and waiver form (GC-211); OR (2) If she cannot be
found, submit a declaration (GC-02), explaining what efforts have been made
to find her. CRC 7.52
4. Do one or the other, but not both: (1) Have a copy of the Notice of Hearing and
Petition Form GC-210 served by mail on maternal grandfather and paternal
grandparents, and file Proof of Service or have each person sign a consent
and waiver form (GC-211); OR (2) If a person cannot be found, submit a
declaration (GC-02) explaining what efforts have been made to find that
person. CRC 7.52
5. File UCCJEA Form GC-120
6. Date Confidential Guardian Screening Forms GC-212. Verifications are not
dated.
7. File a declaration to clarify that you have questioned minor’s relatives as to
whether minor has any Indian ancestry. Item # 8 on Child Information
Attachment Form GC-210 (CA) is incomplete.
8. Submit Order Appointing Guardian of Minor Form GC-240 (revised 7-1-16)
The Court is waiting for these items:
1. Report of atty. Sutter Selleck
Note: Court will dispense with further formal service on father Alan Ignacio Ruiz and
maternal grandmother Mercy Morago who appeared 3-22-2024.
SUPERIOR COURT OF CALIFORNIA, CONTRA COSTA COUNTY
PR - MARTINEZ-WAKEFIELD TAYLOR COURTHOUSE
COURT CALENDAR FOR JULY 17, 2024
DEPARTMENT 33
JUDICIAL OFFICER: SHARA E BELTRAMO
Document
SHIRLEY ANN FORTSON
Jul 15, 2024 |
HON. CASEY R. TUCKER - 2ND DIVISION 6TH CIRCUIT |
SMALL ESTATE |
SMALL ESTATE |
60PR-24-1569
Document
JARRED LEROY TAYLOR
Jul 15, 2024 |
18TH EAST CIRCUIT DIVISION II |
SMALL ESTATE |
SMALL ESTATE |
26PR-24-408
Document
BERNARD C PETRUS
Jul 15, 2024 |
11TH EAST CIRCUIT DIVISION 1 |
DECEDENT ESTATE ADMINISTRATION |
DECEDENT ESTATE ADMINISTRATION |
01SPR-24-42