Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
The Cincinnati Insurance Company A S O Joshua Walker, filed a(n) Automobile - Torts case represented by Kistler, Bernard F, against Hicks, Stephanie Yolanda, in the jurisdiction of Fulton County, GA, . Fulton County, GA Superior Courts with Mather, John R presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeMather, John R Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateJanuary 14, 2020 |
CategoryAutomobile Tort |
Last RefreshedMarch 05, 2022 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationFulton County, GA |
Matter TypeAutomobile |
Summons
Date: January 14, 2020Case Initiation Form
Date: January 14, 2020RETURN OF SERVICE
Date: October 14, 2020RETURN OF SERVICE
Date: June 15, 2020REQUEST FOR PLACEMENT ON A CALENDAR
Date: December 29, 2020Proposed Order
Date: December 18, 2020Motion (OBTS)
Date: December 18, 2020COMPLAINT
Date: 2020-01-14T00:00:00For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.