Case Last Refreshed: 5 months ago
Kone, Inc., filed a(n) General Torts - Torts case represented by Noland, Mary-Margaret F, against Bush Construction Company, Inc. Of Atlanta, in the jurisdiction of Fulton County, GA, . Fulton County, GA Superior Courts GA-Fulton County with CARNESALE, RACHELLE L. presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeCARNESALE, RACHELLE L. Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateDecember 02, 2021 |
CategoryDamages |
Last RefreshedNovember 29, 2023 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationFulton County, GA |
Matter TypeGeneral Torts |
Filing Court HouseGA-Fulton County |
Case Outcome TypeJudgment |
NOTICE OF HEARING
Date: September 21, 2022NOTICE OF HEARING
Date: April 06, 2022ORDER
Date: July 25, 2022CONTINUANCE ORDER
Date: April 19, 2022AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: December 28, 2021AFFIDAVIT
Date: December 28, 2021CASE INITIATION FORM
Date: December 02, 2021ORDER
Date: December 16, 2021DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE
Date: December 08, 2022ENTRY/NOTICE OF APPEARANCE
Date: October 17, 2022SATISFACTION OF JUDGMENT
Date: November 10, 2022FINAL ORDER
Date: October 24, 2022CASE DISPOSITION FORM
Date: December 09, 2022PROPOSED ORDER
Date: September 09, 2022CERTIFICATE
Date: September 09, 2022BRIEF IN SUPPORT OF MOTION
Date: 2022-09-09T00:00:00MOTION
Date: 2022-09-09T00:00:00NOTICE
Date: 2022-08-22T00:00:00MOTION FOR CONTINUANCE
Date: 2022-04-13T00:00:00LEAVE OF ABSENCE
Date: 2022-03-03T00:00:00STIPULATION EXTENDING TIME
Date: 2022-01-18T00:00:00MOTION
Date: 2021-12-13T00:00:00PLAINTIFF'S ORIGINAL PETITION
Date: 2021-12-02T00:00:00ORDER FOR NUNC PRO TUNC FILING
Date: 2021-12-16T00:00:00FOR SERVICE OF DEFENDANTS
Date: 2021-12-02T00:00:00June 29, 2022, at 9:30 a.m.
Date: 2022-04-19T00:00:00Petition and Motion for Relation Back of Filing Date of Plaintiff's Complaint
Date: 2021-12-13T00:00:00Notice of Intent to Pursue Claims
Date: 2022-08-22T00:00:00April 21, 2022, at 10:00 a.m.
Date: 2022-04-06T00:00:00Affidavit of Service - Bush Construction Company, Inc. of Atlanta
Date: 2021-12-28T00:00:00COMPLAINT FOR DAMAGES AND FORECLOSURE OF MECHANIC'S LIEN
Date: 2021-12-02T00:00:00ORDER TO PROSECUTE MATTER
Date: 2022-07-25T00:00:00Stipulation for Extension of Time
Date: 2022-01-18T00:00:00Affidavit of Service - New Grant Acquisitions, LLC
Date: 2021-12-28T00:00:00Motion for Continuance and Order
Date: 2022-04-13T00:00:00Memorandum in Support of Motion for Entry of Default and Default Judgment
Date: 2022-09-09T00:00:00Notice of Hearing 10/17/22
Date: September 21, 2022Leave of Absence for Mary-Margaret Noland
Date: 2022-03-03T00:00:00For Damages and Foreclosure of Mechanic's Lien
Date: 2021-12-02T00:00:00For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.