Case Last Refreshed: 4 months ago
Mn2S Corp., A Florida Corporation, filed a(n) Breach of Contract - Commercial case represented by Clarke, Alan Stuckey, against Hatch, Torrence Ivy Jr., in the jurisdiction of Fulton County, GA, . Fulton County, GA Superior Courts with GLANVILLE, URAL presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeGLANVILLE, URAL Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateDecember 08, 2021 |
CategoryContract/Account |
Last RefreshedNovember 29, 2023 |
Practice AreaCommercial |
Filing LocationFulton County, GA |
Matter TypeBreach of Contract |
Case Outcome TypeJudgment |
ORDER TRANSFER OPEN CASE
Date: May 08, 2023CERTIFICATE
Date: May 05, 2023CERTIFICATE
Date: May 05, 2023CERTIFICATE
Date: May 05, 2023NOTICE
Date: April 06, 2022ORDER OF SERVICE BY PUBLICATION
Date: April 05, 2022LEAVE OF ABSENCE
Date: May 17, 2023CERTIFICATE
Date: June 05, 2023SCHEDULING ORDER
Date: October 05, 2023CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE
Date: July 17, 2023NOTICE
Date: May 09, 2023ANSWER
Date: May 05, 2023ORDER
Date: 2023-04-27T00:00:00AFFIDAVIT
Date: 2023-01-30T00:00:00MOTION
Date: 2023-01-30T00:00:00AFFIDAVIT
Date: 2022-11-07T00:00:00DEFAULT JUDGMENT
Date: 2022-09-22T00:00:00PROPOSED ORDER
Date: 2022-09-20T00:00:00NOTICE OF HEARING
Date: 2022-08-22T00:00:00MOTION
Date: 2022-06-22T00:00:00LEAVE OF ABSENCE
Date: 2022-03-15T00:00:00CASE INITIATION FORM
Date: 2021-12-08T00:00:00MOTION
Date: 2022-02-15T00:00:00PLAINTIFF'S ORIGINAL PETITION
Date: 2021-12-08T00:00:00For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.