Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
Crawford, Jaquon T, filed a(n) Child Support - Family case represented by Reeder, Kathryn Cox, against Snow, Lamario S, in the jurisdiction of Fulton County, GA, . Fulton County, GA Superior Courts with BOWENS, JOANN presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateDecember 30, 2011 |
CategoryChild Support |
Last RefreshedMarch 18, 2022 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationFulton County, GA |
Matter TypeChild Support |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
May 15, 2012 | Docket Event |
ORDER
Judge: ORDER |
|
May 15, 2012 | Docket Event |
EFILE
Judge: EFILE |
|
May 01, 2012 | Docket Event |
EFILE
Judge: EFILE |
|
May 01, 2012 | Docket Event |
NOTICE
Judge: NOTICE |
|
April 26, 2012 | Docket Event |
NON JURY TRIAL (9:00 AM) (Judicial Officer: BOWENS, JOANN)
Judge: BOWENS, JOANN |
|
January 23, 2012 | Docket Event |
EFILE
Judge: EFILE |
|
January 23, 2012 | Docket Event |
ORDER
Judge: ORDER |
|
December 30, 2011 | Docket Event |
Conversion
Judge: Conversion |
|
December 30, 2011 | Docket Event |
CASE INITIATION FORM
Judge: CASE INITIATION FORM |
|
December 30, 2011 | Docket Event |
EFILE
Judge: EFILE |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.