Case Last Refreshed: 1 year ago
Ford, Beverly, filed a(n) General Appeals - Appeals case against Grady Hospital, in the jurisdiction of Fulton County, GA, . Fulton County, GA Superior Courts with BAXTER, JERRY presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeBAXTER, JERRY Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateDecember 30, 2010 |
CategoryJudicial Review |
Last RefreshedAugust 20, 2022 |
Practice AreaAppeals |
Filing LocationFulton County, GA |
Matter TypeGeneral Appeals |
NOTICE
Date: February 22, 2011CASE INITIATION FORM
Date: December 30, 2010SHERIFF'S ENTRY OF SERVICE
Date: January 06, 2011PLAINTIFF'S ORIGINAL PETITION
Date: December 30, 2010RECORD OF BOARD OF REVIEW
Date: February 04, 2011ORDER
Date: March 14, 2011For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.