Case Last Refreshed: 5 months ago
Douglas County Bank, filed a(n) Foreclosure - Property case represented by Powell, Anthony O L, against Albracht, Craig L, represented by Pohlmann, Aaron E., in the jurisdiction of Fulton County, GA, . Fulton County, GA Superior Courts with LAGRUA, SHAWN ELLEN presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateDecember 29, 2010 |
CategoryForeclosure |
Last RefreshedNovember 30, 2023 |
Practice AreaProperty |
Filing LocationFulton County, GA |
Matter TypeForeclosure |
ORDER
Date: August 16, 2012SHERIFF'S ENTRY OF SERVICE
Date: January 18, 2011SHERIFF'S ENTRY OF SERVICE
Date: January 04, 2011CASE INITIATION FORM
Date: December 29, 2010LEAVE OF ABSENCE
Date: February 22, 2013LEAVE OF ABSENCE
Date: January 22, 2013LEAVE OF ABSENCE
Date: January 28, 2013ORDER
Date: August 16, 2012MOTION
Date: 2012-08-02T00:00:00NOTICE/SUGGESTION OF BANKRUPTCY
Date: 2012-08-15T00:00:00ORDER
Date: 2012-07-27T00:00:00MOTION
Date: 2012-05-31T00:00:00ORDER
Date: 2012-06-14T00:00:00REPLY
Date: 2012-05-24T00:00:00BRIEF
Date: 2012-05-08T00:00:00LEAVE OF ABSENCE
Date: 2012-05-10T00:00:00BRIEF IN OPPOSITION OF MOTION
Date: 2012-05-03T00:00:00RESPONSE
Date: 2012-05-03T00:00:00LEAVE OF ABSENCE
Date: 2012-05-02T00:00:00RESPONSE
Date: 2012-04-25T00:00:00STIPULATION EXTENDING TIME
Date: 2012-04-27T00:00:00RESPONSE
Date: 2012-04-25T00:00:00RESPONSE
Date: 2012-04-25T00:00:00LEAVE OF ABSENCE
Date: 2012-04-23T00:00:00MOTION
Date: 2012-03-26T00:00:00AFFIDAVIT
Date: 2012-03-30T00:00:00BRIEF IN SUPPORT OF MOTION
Date: 2011-11-18T00:00:00BRIEF
Date: 2012-02-24T00:00:00LEAVE OF ABSENCE
Date: 2011-08-24T00:00:00AFFIDAVIT
Date: 2012-02-24T00:00:00MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT
Date: 2012-03-30T00:00:00DEPOSITION
Date: 2012-02-24T00:00:00STATEMENT OF MATERIAL FACTS
Date: 2012-03-30T00:00:00RESPONSE
Date: 2012-03-30T00:00:00NOTICE
Date: 2011-09-16T00:00:00ORDER
Date: 2011-06-22T00:00:00AMENDED COMPLAINT
Date: 2011-07-21T00:00:00CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE
Date: 2011-09-23T00:00:00CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE
Date: 2012-02-24T00:00:00MOTION TO DISMISS
Date: 2011-11-18T00:00:00NOTICE OF FILING
Date: 2012-02-24T00:00:00AFFIDAVIT
Date: 2012-02-24T00:00:00MEMORANDUM
Date: 2012-03-30T00:00:00MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT
Date: 2012-02-24T00:00:00MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT
Date: 2012-03-30T00:00:00CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE
Date: 2011-10-26T00:00:00STIPULATION EXTENDING TIME
Date: 2012-03-27T00:00:00MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT
Date: 2012-03-27T00:00:00LEAVE OF ABSENCE
Date: 2012-03-05T00:00:00MOTION
Date: 2012-03-30T00:00:00LEAVE OF ABSENCE
Date: 2012-03-19T00:00:00RESPONSE
Date: 2011-12-19T00:00:00BRIEF IN SUPPORT OF MOTION
Date: 2012-03-27T00:00:00ANSWER
Date: 2011-08-26T00:00:00SHERIFF'S ENTRY OF SERVICE
Date: 2011-08-05T00:00:00LEAVE OF ABSENCE
Date: 2012-01-13T00:00:00STATEMENT OF UNDISPUTED MATERIAL FACTS
Date: 2012-03-27T00:00:00CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE
Date: 2011-06-29T00:00:00RESPONSE
Date: 2012-03-30T00:00:00ORDER
Date: 2011-03-24T00:00:00CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE
Date: 2011-03-25T00:00:00CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE
Date: 2011-03-03T00:00:00ENTRY/NOTICE OF APPEARANCE
Date: 2011-03-03T00:00:00STIPULATION EXTENDING TIME
Date: 2011-03-04T00:00:00CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE
Date: 2011-03-25T00:00:00CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE
Date: 2011-03-25T00:00:00ANSWER
Date: 2011-04-08T00:00:00ANSWER
Date: 2011-03-14T00:00:00LEAVE OF ABSENCE
Date: 2011-03-30T00:00:00MOTION
Date: 2011-03-21T00:00:00CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE
Date: 2011-04-04T00:00:00CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE
Date: 2011-05-31T00:00:00CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE
Date: 2011-03-03T00:00:00SCHEDULING ORDER
Date: 2011-02-28T00:00:00RESPONSE
Date: 2011-02-24T00:00:00CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE
Date: 2011-02-24T00:00:00AMENDED COMPLAINT
Date: 2011-02-24T00:00:00STIPULATION EXTENDING TIME
Date: 2011-02-17T00:00:00ANSWER
Date: 2011-02-09T00:00:00ANSWER
Date: 2011-02-04T00:00:00LEAVE OF ABSENCE
Date: 2011-02-03T00:00:00LEAVE OF ABSENCE
Date: 2011-02-02T00:00:00RULE NISI
Date: 2011-01-28T00:00:00RULE NISI
Date: 2011-01-25T00:00:00STIPULATION EXTENDING TIME
Date: 2011-01-21T00:00:00AFFIDAVIT
Date: 2010-12-29T00:00:00PLAINTIFF'S ORIGINAL PETITION
Date: 2010-12-29T00:00:00STIPULATION EXTENDING TIME
Date: 2012-04-27T00:00:00LEAVE OF ABSENCE
Date: 2012-05-02T00:00:00RESPONSE
Date: 2012-05-03T00:00:00BRIEF IN OPPOSITION OF MOTION
Date: 2012-05-03T00:00:00BRIEF
Date: 2012-05-08T00:00:00LEAVE OF ABSENCE
Date: 2012-05-10T00:00:00REPLY
Date: 2012-05-24T00:00:00ORDER
Date: 2012-06-14T00:00:00MOTION
Date: 2012-05-31T00:00:00ORDER
Date: 2012-07-27T00:00:00MOTION
Date: 2012-08-02T00:00:00NOTICE/SUGGESTION OF BANKRUPTCY
Date: 2012-08-15T00:00:00LEAVE OF ABSENCE
Date: January 22, 2013LEAVE OF ABSENCE
Date: January 28, 2013LEAVE OF ABSENCE
Date: February 22, 2013For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.