We are checking for the latest updates in this case. We will email you when the process is complete.
Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
Green, Kimberly C ,
filed a(n)
Divorce,Separation -
Family
case
against
Green, Marlon D Sr. ,
in the jurisdiction of Fulton County, GA, .
Fulton County, GA
Superior Courts
with LANE, BENSONETTA presiding.
Filing Date
July 30, 2010
Category
Divorce - Uncontested
Last Refreshed
March 18, 2022
Filing Location
Fulton County, GA
Matter Type
Divorce,Separation
OTHER
Date: September 15, 2010
Case Events for
Green, Kimberly C v. Green, Marlon D Sr.
Date
Type
Description
September 27, 2010
Docket Event
MICROFILMED FILE
Judge: MICROFILMED FILE
September 15, 2010
Docket Event
FINAL JUDGMENT AND DECREE
Judge: FINAL JUDGMENT AND DECREE
Get Document
September 15, 2010
Docket Event
UNCONTESTED DOMESTIC (9:00 AM) (Judicial Officer: LANE, BENSONETTA)
Judge: LANE, BENSONETTA
September 15, 2010
Docket Event
OTHER
Judge: OTHER
Get Document
September 15, 2010
Docket Event
AGREEMENT
Judge: AGREEMENT
Get Document
September 15, 2010
Docket Event
CHILD SUPPORT WORKSHEET (INDEX AND NOT SCAN)
Judge: CHILD SUPPORT WORKSHEET (INDEX AND NOT SCAN
September 01, 2010
Docket Event
CERTIFICATE
Judge: CERTIFICATE
July 30, 2010
Docket Event
Conversion
Judge: Conversion
July 30, 2010
Docket Event
PLAINTIFF'S ORIGINAL PETITION
Judge: PLAINTIFF'S ORIGINAL PETITION
July 30, 2010
Docket Event
CONSENT ORDER
Judge: CONSENT ORDER
See all events
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.