Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
Lambert, Sherry Renee, filed a(n) Divorce,Separation - Family case against Lambert, Warren Jerome, in the jurisdiction of Fulton County, GA, . Fulton County, GA Superior Courts with SHOOB, WENDY presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateDecember 28, 2005 |
CategoryDivorce - Uncontested |
Last RefreshedMarch 18, 2022 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationFulton County, GA |
Matter TypeDivorce,Separation |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
October 27, 2011 | Docket Event |
ORDER
Judge: ORDER |
|
June 23, 2010 | Docket Event |
ORDER
Judge: ORDER |
|
June 22, 2010 | Docket Event |
RULE NISI (2:30 PM) (Judicial Officer: SHOOB, WENDY)
Judge: SHOOB, WENDY |
|
June 21, 2010 | Docket Event |
CERTIFICATE
Judge: CERTIFICATE |
|
June 21, 2010 | Docket Event |
ANSWER
Judge: ANSWER |
|
June 02, 2010 | Docket Event |
ENTRY/NOTICE OF APPEARANCE
Judge: ENTRY/NOTICE OF APPEARANCE |
|
June 02, 2010 | Docket Event |
LEAVE OF ABSENCE
Judge: LEAVE OF ABSENCE |
|
May 18, 2010 | Docket Event |
CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE
Judge: CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE |
|
May 04, 2010 | Docket Event |
RULE NISI
Judge: RULE NISI |
|
April 29, 2010 | Docket Event |
RULE NISI (3:00 PM) (Judicial Officer: SHOOB, WENDY)
Judge: SHOOB, WENDY |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.