Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
Kolias, Stephen G, filed a(n) Divorce,Separation - Family case against Kolias, Nadine, in the jurisdiction of Fulton County, GA, . Fulton County, GA Superior Courts with GOGER, JOHN presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateNovember 14, 2005 |
CategoryDivorce - Uncontested |
Last RefreshedMarch 18, 2022 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationFulton County, GA |
Matter TypeDivorce,Separation |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
September 23, 2010 | Docket Event |
ORDER
Judge: ORDER |
|
September 21, 2010 | Docket Event |
MOTION
Judge: MOTION |
|
June 28, 2010 | Docket Event |
CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE
Judge: CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE |
|
June 23, 2010 | Docket Event |
RULE NISI (9:00 AM) (Judicial Officer: GOGER, JOHN)
Judge: GOGER, JOHN |
|
June 17, 2010 | Docket Event |
RULE NISI
Judge: RULE NISI |
|
June 17, 2010 | Docket Event |
CONTEMPT
Judge: CONTEMPT |
|
May 24, 2010 | Docket Event |
RULE NISI (10:00 AM) (Judicial Officer: GOGER, JOHN)
Judge: GOGER, JOHN |
|
May 12, 2010 | Docket Event |
RULE NISI
Judge: RULE NISI |
|
May 11, 2010 | Docket Event |
RULE NISI (10:00 AM) (Judicial Officer: GOGER, JOHN)
Judge: GOGER, JOHN |
|
April 15, 2010 | Docket Event |
ORDER
Judge: ORDER |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.