Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
American Express National Bank, filed a(n) Breach of Contract - Commercial case represented by Turner, Brittney R, against Round Here Renovations, Llc, represented by Leitman, Hal J., in the jurisdiction of Fulton County, GA, . Fulton County, GA Superior Courts with Richardson, Eric presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeRichardson, Eric Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateFebruary 15, 2019 |
CategoryContract |
Last RefreshedFebruary 11, 2022 |
Practice AreaCommercial |
Filing LocationFulton County, GA |
Matter TypeBreach of Contract |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
March 04, 2020 | Docket Event | DISMISSAL | |
March 04, 2020 | Docket Event | Case Dispostition Form | |
February 05, 2020 | Docket Event | NOTICE | |
April 22, 2019 | Docket Event | Address Change | |
March 07, 2019 | Docket Event | ANSWER | |
March 07, 2019 | Docket Event | CERTIFICATE | |
March 05, 2019 | Docket Event | SERVICE | |
February 27, 2019 | Docket Event | SERVICE | |
February 21, 2019 | Docket Event | Service to Marshal/Process Server | |
February 15, 2019 | Docket Event | Case Initiation Form |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.