Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
Bnk Inc, filed a(n) Account case represented by Van De Water, Eric N, against Bellkor Station Llc Dba Manor Glen Apartments, in the jurisdiction of Fulton County, GA, . Fulton County, GA Superior Courts with Forsling, Susan B presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateJuly 01, 2013 |
CategoryAccount |
Last RefreshedOctober 29, 2021 |
|
Filing LocationFulton County, GA |
|
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
March 27, 2014 | Docket Event | FIFA TO PLTF | |
March 14, 2014 | Docket Event | AFFIDAVIT | |
March 10, 2014 | Docket Event | ORDER | |
October 31, 2013 | Docket Event | FILE CHECKED BACK IN | |
October 29, 2013 | Docket Event | FINAL DISPOSITION FORM | |
October 29, 2013 | Docket Event | CASE IS NOW CLOSED | |
October 29, 2013 | Docket Event | Conversion | |
October 17, 2013 | Docket Event | NOTICE | |
September 25, 2013 | Docket Event | Conversion | |
September 25, 2013 | Docket Event | AFFIDAVIT |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.