Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
The State Of Georgia, filed a(n) General Criminal - Criminal case represented by Mcgruder, Elaine T, in the jurisdiction of Fulton County, GA, . Fulton County, GA Superior Courts with Forsling, Susan B presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateJuly 23, 2013 |
CategoryMisdemeanor |
Last RefreshedMarch 17, 2022 |
Practice AreaCriminal |
Filing LocationFulton County, GA |
Matter TypeGeneral Criminal |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
March 25, 2014 | Docket Event |
PETITION/ORDER:REVOCATION PROB
Judge: PETITION/ORDER:REVOCATION PROB |
|
March 25, 2014 | Docket Event |
REQUEST FOR WARRANT DISMISSAL
Judge: REQUEST FOR WARRANT DISMISSAL |
|
February 26, 2014 | Docket Event |
Arrest Warrant Issued (OBTS)
Judge: Arrest Warrant Issued (OBTS |
|
September 05, 2013 | Docket Event |
Disposition (Judicial Officer: Lacour, Stefani) 2. Obstruction Of Law Enforcement Officers - Misdemeanor PLEAD GUILTY - GECPS Transmit 2. Obstruction Of Law Enforcement Officers - Misdemeanor PLEAD GUILTY - GECPS Transmit 2. Obstruction Of Law Enforcement Officers - Misdemeanor PLEAD GUILTY - GECPS Transmit 2. Obstruction Of Law Enforcement Officers - Misdemeanor PLEAD GUILTY - GECPS Transmit
Judge: Lacour, Stefani |
|
September 05, 2013 | Docket Event |
Sentence (Judicial Officer: Lacour, Stefani) 1. Battery Visible Harm BALANCE PROBATED Condition - Adult: MONTHLY PROBATION FEE, 09/05/2013, Active 09/05/2013 NO FURTHER CONTACT, 09/05/2013, Active 09/05/2013 Comment: $49.00;NFC W/DEWAYNE HIGH & lATRECE WILLIAMS Confinement ( Fulton County Jail, 180 Days , Time Served Concurrent ) Probation ( 12 Mo ) Served Time ( Credit with Time Served of 50 Days )
Judge: Lacour, Stefani |
|
September 05, 2013 | Docket Event |
Sentence (Judicial Officer: Lacour, Stefani) 2. Obstruction Of Law Enforcement Officers - Misdemeanor BALANCE PROBATED Condition - Adult: MONTHLY PROBATION FEE, 09/05/2013, Active 09/05/2013 Comment: $49.00 Confinement ( Fulton County Jail, 180 Days , Time Served Concurrent ) Probation ( 12 Mo ) Served Time ( Credit with Time Served of 50 Days )
Judge: Lacour, Stefani |
|
September 05, 2013 | Docket Event |
NON JURY TRIAL (9:00 AM)
Judge: NON JURY TRIAL (9:00 AM |
|
September 05, 2013 | Docket Event |
OBTS:
Judge: OBTS: |
|
September 05, 2013 | Docket Event |
Plea (Judicial Officer: Lacour, Stefani) PONDER, JEREMIAH 1. Battery Visible Harm NEGOTIATED PLEA OBTS: 88390854683 Sequence: 001 PONDER, JEREMIAH 2. Obstruction Of Law Enforcement Officers - Misdemeanor NEGOTIATED PLEA
Judge: Lacour, Stefani |
|
August 22, 2013 | Docket Event |
JAIL NON JURY (9:00 AM)
Judge: JAIL NON JURY (9:00 AM |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.