Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
Larry S. Hyman, As Trustee Of The Island One Unsecured, filed a(n) Judgment Enforcement - Creditor case represented by Ramsey, Shane G, against International Cruise & Excursion Gallery, Inc. D B A Int'L, in the jurisdiction of Fulton County, GA, . Fulton County, GA Superior Courts with Eady, Fred C presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateJune 27, 2012 |
CategoryForeign Judgment |
Last RefreshedOctober 31, 2021 |
Practice AreaCreditor |
Filing LocationFulton County, GA |
Matter TypeJudgment Enforcement |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
October 09, 2012 | Docket Event | CASE IS NOW CLOSED | |
September 21, 2012 | Docket Event | READY MOTIONS | |
September 21, 2012 | Docket Event | MOTION TO DISMISS | |
August 06, 2012 | Docket Event | CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE | |
July 03, 2012 | Docket Event | PAYMENT | |
June 27, 2012 | Docket Event | PLTF COMPLETE NAME | |
June 27, 2012 | Docket Event | RUSH FEE | |
June 27, 2012 | Docket Event | STATE COURT SUIT - NO SERVICE | |
June 27, 2012 | Docket Event | FOREIGN JUDGMENT | |
June 27, 2012 | Docket Event | DEFT COMPLETE NAME |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.