Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
Harris, Willie, filed a(n) Breach of Contract - Commercial case represented by Shoemaker, Adam J, against Arron Woodhouse, represented by Mason, Jonathan Braxton, in the jurisdiction of Fulton County, GA, . Fulton County, GA Superior Courts with Porter, Patsy Y presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateJune 30, 2010 |
CategoryContract |
Last RefreshedNovember 05, 2021 |
Practice AreaCommercial |
Filing LocationFulton County, GA |
Matter TypeBreach of Contract |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
August 23, 2013 | Docket Event | Conversion | |
August 23, 2013 | Docket Event | SUBSTITUTION OF COUNSEL | |
August 19, 2013 | Docket Event | Notice of Hearing Mailed | |
July 16, 2013 | Docket Event | FILED CHECKED OUT | |
May 31, 2013 | Docket Event | READY MOTIONS | |
March 14, 2013 | Docket Event | READY NON JURY -SS | |
March 14, 2013 | Docket Event | MOTION | |
February 10, 2012 | Docket Event | Conversion | |
October 27, 2011 | Docket Event | FILE CHECKED BACK IN | |
October 21, 2011 | Docket Event | CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.