Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
Britt' S Home Furnishings Inc, filed a(n) Account case represented by Charles T. Day Iii, against Bostic Contracting, Llc, in the jurisdiction of Fulton County, GA, . Fulton County, GA Superior Courts with Mather, John R presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateOctober 20, 2008 |
CategoryAccount |
Last RefreshedMarch 17, 2022 |
|
Filing LocationFulton County, GA |
|
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
October 02, 2009 | Docket Event |
FIFA TO PLTF
Judge: FIFA TO PLTF |
|
October 02, 2009 | Docket Event |
FILE CHECKED BACK IN
Judge: FILE CHECKED BACK IN |
|
October 02, 2009 | Docket Event |
CASE IS NOW CLOSED
Judge: CASE IS NOW CLOSED |
|
June 22, 2009 | Docket Event |
DEFAULT
Judge: DEFAULT |
|
June 22, 2009 | Docket Event |
FINAL DISPOSITION FORM
Judge: FINAL DISPOSITION FORM |
|
June 16, 2009 | Docket Event |
FILED CHECKED OUT
Judge: FILED CHECKED OUT |
|
April 15, 2009 | Docket Event |
REQUEST FOR DEFAULT JUDGMENT
Judge: REQUEST FOR DEFAULT JUDGMENT |
|
March 12, 2009 | Docket Event |
Conversion
Judge: Conversion |
|
January 28, 2009 | Docket Event |
NON EST SERVICE
Judge: NON EST SERVICE |
|
January 12, 2009 | Docket Event |
PAYMENT
Judge: PAYMENT |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.