Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
The Sherwin-Williams Co, filed a(n) Account case represented by Busch, James C, against Atlantic Classics Building Group Llc, in the jurisdiction of Fulton County, GA, . Fulton County, GA Superior Courts with Edlein, Susan E presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateOctober 20, 2008 |
CategoryAccount |
Last RefreshedNovember 30, 2021 |
|
Filing LocationFulton County, GA |
|
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
November 19, 2009 | Docket Event | Conversion | |
November 09, 2009 | Docket Event | WITHDRAWAL OF MOTION | |
October 12, 2009 | Docket Event | FILE CHECKED BACK IN | |
October 01, 2009 | Docket Event | Conversion | |
September 18, 2009 | Docket Event | FILED CHECKED OUT | |
August 10, 2009 | Docket Event | MOTION | |
August 10, 2009 | Docket Event | READY MOTIONS | |
June 09, 2009 | Docket Event | FILE CHECKED BACK IN | |
June 08, 2009 | Docket Event | FILED CHECKED OUT | |
May 07, 2009 | Docket Event | WITHDRAWAL OF MOTION |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.