Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
Stratmore Carperts Inc Dba Strathmore Floors, filed a(n) Efiledstate Civil case represented by Gisler, Charles M, against Silver Summit Properties, Llc, in the jurisdiction of Fulton County, GA, . Fulton County, GA Superior Courts with Bessen, Diane E presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateOctober 20, 2008 |
CategoryEfiledstate Civil |
Last RefreshedDecember 02, 2021 |
|
Filing LocationFulton County, GA |
|
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
May 15, 2015 | Docket Event | NOTICE | |
March 10, 2009 | Docket Event | CONSENT ORDER | |
March 10, 2009 | Docket Event | CASE IS NOW CLOSED | |
March 04, 2009 | Docket Event | CONSENT ORDER | |
December 15, 2008 | Docket Event | NOTICE | |
November 25, 2008 | Docket Event | ANSWER | |
October 27, 2008 | Docket Event | RETURN OF SERVICE | |
October 27, 2008 | Docket Event | CORPORATE SERVICE | |
October 20, 2008 | Docket Event | Summons | |
October 20, 2008 | Docket Event | EXHIBIT |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.