Your recipients will receive an email with this envelope shortly and will be able to access it on trellis. You can always see your envelopes by clicking the Inbox on the top right hand corner.
KYMSTA CORP VS MELROSE VENTURES INC DBA
A Contract case was filed by Kymsta Corporation, represented by Curtin Law Firm Pc, against Melrose Ventures Inc Dba Melrose, in the jurisdiction of Fulton County, GA. Judge Bessen, Diane E presiding.
Case Details
Case Number
Filing Date
January 09, 2006
Last Refreshed
March 17, 2022
Filing Location
Fulton County, GA
Category
CONTRACT
Practice Area
Commercial
Matter Type
Breach of Contract
Parties
Plaintiffs
Attorneys for Plaintiffs
Defendants
Case Events
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
March 22, 2013 | Docket Event |
FILE CHECKED BACK IN
Judge: FILE CHECKED BACK IN |
|
March 22, 2013 | Docket Event |
FILE REC'D FROM ARCHIVES
Judge: FILE REC'D FROM ARCHIVES |
|
February 26, 2013 | Docket Event |
FINAL ORDER
Judge: FINAL ORDER |
|
February 26, 2013 | Docket Event |
CASE IS NOW CLOSED
Judge: CASE IS NOW CLOSED |
|
February 13, 2013 | Docket Event |
Conversion (2:00 PM) (Judicial Officer: Bessen, Diane E)
Judge: Bessen, Diane E |
|
February 05, 2013 | Docket Event |
FILED CHECKED OUT
Judge: FILED CHECKED OUT |
|
February 04, 2013 | Docket Event |
FILE REC'D FROM ARCHIVES
Judge: FILE REC'D FROM ARCHIVES |
|
January 23, 2013 | Docket Event |
Notice of Hearing Mailed
Judge: Notice of Hearing Mailed |
|
January 22, 2013 | Docket Event |
Notice of Hearing Mailed
Judge: Notice of Hearing Mailed |
|
December 21, 2006 | Docket Event |
FIFA TO PLTF
Judge: FIFA TO PLTF |
|
December 19, 2006 | Docket Event |
DEFAULT ON CONSENT
Judge: DEFAULT ON CONSENT |
|
November 06, 2006 | Docket Event |
MOTION
Judge: MOTION |
|
July 05, 2006 | Docket Event |
Conversion
Judge: Conversion |
|
June 26, 2006 | Docket Event |
Conversion
Judge: Conversion |
|
April 05, 2006 | Docket Event |
SERVICE
Judge: SERVICE |
|
March 28, 2006 | Docket Event |
PAYMENT
Judge: PAYMENT |
|
January 09, 2006 | Docket Event |
STATE COURT SUIT - NO SERVICE
Judge: STATE COURT SUIT - NO SERVICE |