Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
Sherman Interiors Inc, filed a(n) Account case represented by Keough, Thomas V Keough, Thomas V Keough, Thomas V Keough, Thomas V, against Pershing Management Group Llc Dba Specialty Homes, in the jurisdiction of Fulton County, GA, . Fulton County, GA Superior Courts with Porter, Patsy Y presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateDecember 28, 2005 |
CategoryAccount |
Last RefreshedDecember 09, 2021 |
|
Filing LocationFulton County, GA |
|
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
January 10, 2007 | Docket Event | FINAL ORDER | |
January 09, 2007 | Docket Event | SERVICE | |
December 12, 2006 | Docket Event | Conversion | |
November 13, 2006 | Docket Event | WITHDRAWAL OF MOTION | |
October 25, 2006 | Docket Event | AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE | |
July 06, 2006 | Docket Event | CASE IS NOW CLOSED | |
July 06, 2006 | Docket Event | SUBPOENA SENT | |
April 26, 2006 | Docket Event | DEFAULT | |
April 26, 2006 | Docket Event | FIFA TO PLTF | |
February 09, 2006 | Docket Event | AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.