Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
Tbi Inc, filed a(n) Account case represented by Macey Wilensky Kessler Howick & Westfall Llp, against Ns Carriers Inc, in the jurisdiction of Fulton County, GA, . Fulton County, GA Superior Courts with Tailor, Wesley B presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateNovember 30, 2005 |
CategoryAccount |
Last RefreshedDecember 08, 2021 |
|
Filing LocationFulton County, GA |
|
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
August 16, 2013 | Docket Event | CASE IS NOW CLOSED | |
March 22, 2006 | Docket Event | PAYMENT | |
March 22, 2006 | Docket Event | RUSH FEE | |
February 15, 2006 | Docket Event | ORDER TO TRANSFER | |
February 09, 2006 | Docket Event | Conversion | |
February 07, 2006 | Docket Event | Conversion | |
February 02, 2006 | Docket Event | Conversion | |
December 02, 2005 | Docket Event | NON EST SERVICE | |
November 30, 2005 | Docket Event | STATE COURT SUIT 1 SVS |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.